NY S01975 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds cargo bicycles with electric assist to the types of bicycles with electric assist regulated under the vehicle and traffic law; provides that no person shall operate a cargo bicycle with electric assist unless it is accompanied by proof of financial security unless otherwise authorized by local law, ordinance, order, rule, or regulation or pursuant to an agreement made on behalf of the city, town, or village.
Title
Adds cargo bicycles with electric assist to the types of bicycles with electric assist regulated under the vehicle and traffic law; provides that no person shall operate a cargo bicycle with electric assist unless it is accompanied by proof of financial security unless otherwise authorized by local law, ordinance, order, rule, or regulation or pursuant to an agreement made on behalf of the city, town, or village.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2023-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-02-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-02-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.270 |
2023-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03874 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to transportation