NY S01974 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - ordered to third reading rules cal.337
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the commission on retired racehorses, which shall be responsible for the oversight of retired racehorses including the creation of a registry to track such racehorses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the commission on retired racehorses, which shall be responsible for the oversight of retired racehorses including the creation of a registry to track such racehorses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming And Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.337
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a3535a
2019-06-11Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-29SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 1974A
2019-03-11SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-07Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-06Senate1ST REPORT CAL.231
2019-01-18SenateREFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING

Same As/Similar To

A03535 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - substituted by s1974a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback