NY S01971 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - SIGNED CHAP.266
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - SIGNED CHAP.266
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the distribution of the state register; requires the department of state make available at no cost an online version of the weekly state register, quarterly index and any special issues as directed by statute or deemed appropriate by the secretary of state.
Title
Relates to the distribution of the state register; requires the department of state make available at no cost an online version of the weekly state register, quarterly index and any special issues as directed by statute or deemed appropriate by the secretary of state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-19 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.266 |
2016-08-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.738 |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | substituted for a1099 |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2016-05-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.804 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2015-05-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-04-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.479 |
2015-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A01099 (Same As) 2016-06-01 - substituted by s1971