NY S01962 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - referred to consumer affairs and protection
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - referred to consumer affairs and protection
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires children's non-regulated camps to register annually with the department of state; imposes civil penalties for violations; requires the department of state to submit a report to the department of health that includes a list of all registered children's non-regulated camps within the state; the location of each children's non-regulated camp; how many children attend a children's non-regulated camp; and a list of all entities that committed a violation of this section for the previous calendar year.
Title
Requires children's non-regulated camps to register annually with the department of state; imposes civil penalties for violations; requires the department of state to submit a report to the department of health that includes a list of all registered children's non-regulated camps within the state; the location of each children's non-regulated camp; how many children attend a children's non-regulated camp; and a list of all entities that committed a violation of this section for the previous calendar year.
Sponsors
Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Elijah Reichlin-Melnick [D] | Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
Sen. Kevin Thomas [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2022-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1019 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1962A |
2022-03-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2021-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A00248 (Same As) 2022-03-10 - print number 248a