NY S01952 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - PRINT NUMBER 1952A
Pending: Senate Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - PRINT NUMBER 1952A
Pending: Senate Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes alcoholic beverage licensees to confiscate written evidence of age which is false or fraudulent; provides such written evidence of age shall be delivered to the police for verification, and returned to rightful holder or destroyed.
Title
Authorizes alcoholic beverage licensees to confiscate written evidence of age which is false or fraudulent; provides such written evidence of age shall be delivered to the police for verification, and returned to rightful holder or destroyed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1952A |
2018-03-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.943 |
2017-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
Same As/Similar To
A05197 (Same As) 2018-03-27 - print number 5197a