NY S01937 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires explanatory statements regarding disposal of property to include the names of all beneficial owners.
Title
Requires explanatory statements regarding disposal of property to include the names of all beneficial owners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-01-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.279 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2023-03-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-01-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-01-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.178 |
2023-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |