NY S01936 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for requirements for disposals and contracts for disposal of property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for requirements for disposals and contracts for disposal of property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-22Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions
2024-05-22SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-05-22SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-02-05SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-01-31Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-01-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.278
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-06-05Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions
2023-06-05SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-05SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-01-25SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-01-24Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-01-23Senate1ST REPORT CAL.177
2023-01-17SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback