NY S01933 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes St. Patrick's day, March 17th, as a school holiday for all city school districts of cities of one million inhabitants or more.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes St. Patrick's day, March 17th, as a school holiday for all city school districts of cities of one million inhabitants or more.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2018-03-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-03-12Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-03-06Senate1ST REPORT CAL.574
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-03-20Assemblyreferred to education
2017-03-20SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-03-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-03-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-03-08Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-03-07Senate1ST REPORT CAL.366
2017-01-11SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A06360 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to education

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback