NY S01925 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-15 - SIGNED CHAP.623
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-15 - SIGNED CHAP.623
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds additional factors to be considered when determining if a child safety zone should be considered hazardous.
Title
Adds additional factors to be considered when determining if a child safety zone should be considered hazardous.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-15 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.623 |
2021-11-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.300 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | substituted for a3093 |
2021-03-30 | Assembly | referred to education |
2021-03-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.616 |
2021-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03093 (Same As) 2021-06-02 - substituted by s1925