NY S01917 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a training program to foster awareness of laws, rules and regulations pertaining to the farming industry; provides for funding of such program from fines collected pursuant to certain violations.
Title
Establishes a training program to foster awareness of laws, rules and regulations pertaining to the farming industry; provides for funding of such program from fines collected pursuant to certain violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.304 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2017-06-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1917A |
2017-05-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2017-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04475 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to environmental conservation