NY S01914 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to reductions of payments in lieu of taxes; provides that where such payment agreement is to be reduced due to a reassessment of the parcel of real property such agreement is related to, such reduction shall be phased in over 10 years if the reduction would negatively affect the revenues of a local government by more than 5%.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to reductions of payments in lieu of taxes; provides that where such payment agreement is to be reduced due to a reassessment of the parcel of real property such agreement is related to, such reduction shall be phased in over 10 years if the reduction would negatively affect the revenues of a local government by more than 5%.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-13Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-12Senate1ST REPORT CAL.283
2019-02-04SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-01-17SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A00146 (Same As) 2019-01-09 - referred to real property taxation

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback