NY S01908 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-23 - PRINT NUMBER 1908A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-23 - PRINT NUMBER 1908A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing the retention percentage for certain motor vehicle service fees.
Title
Relates to increasing the retention percentage for certain motor vehicle service fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1908A |
2018-02-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1409 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03397 (Same As) 2018-02-28 - print number 3397a