NY S01889 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - SIGNED CHAP.719
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - SIGNED CHAP.719
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing accidental disability retirement benefits for fire protection specialists.
Title
Relates to providing accidental disability retirement benefits for fire protection specialists.
Sponsors
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. John Mannion [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-16 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.719 |
2022-12-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.294 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | substituted for a4084c |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | AMENDED 1889C |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.999 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-03-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1889B |
2022-03-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-05-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1889A |
2021-05-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04084 (Same As) 2022-05-23 - substituted by s1889c