NY S01889 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the minimum tuition assistance program award and increases the tuition assistance program income threshold.
Title
Increases the minimum tuition assistance program award and increases the tuition assistance program income threshold.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-01-23 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2019-01-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-01-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.39 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05250 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to higher education