NY S01872 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-22 - signed chap.181
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-22 - signed chap.181
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the authorities budget office to suspend local authority board members and executive staff for failure to submit any report required by public authorities law section 2800.
Title
Authorizes the authorities budget office to suspend local authority board members and executive staff for failure to submit any report required by public authorities law section 2800.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-22 | Senate | signed chap.181 |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.105 |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1872 |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2019-03-18 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-03-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-14 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.124 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | reported |
2019-02-12 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-09 | Senate | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-04-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A220 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.105 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00220 (Same As) 2019-08-22 - signed chap.181