NY S01868 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-01 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the town of Dekalb, in the county of St. Lawrence, to reduce the maximum speed limit on a portion of United States route eleven.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the town of Dekalb, in the county of St. Lawrence, to reduce the maximum speed limit on a portion of United States route eleven.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-01SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2021-01-26Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2021-01-25Senate1ST REPORT CAL.168
2021-01-16SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A04201 (Same As) 2021-02-01 - referred to transportation

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback