NY S01854 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the state power authority and the Long Island power authority to webcast all public meetings, record such meetings and make them accessible from the website for at least one year.
Title
Requires the state power authority and the Long Island power authority to webcast all public meetings, record such meetings and make them accessible from the website for at least one year.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.93 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-02-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | AMENDED 1854A |
2017-02-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.174 |
2017-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |