NY S01851 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the rendering of an estimated bill from a utility corporation or municipality under certain circumstances; requires each utility corporation and municipality within six months to submit to the commission a model procedure for the calculation of estimated bills that incorporates best practices and technology and accounts for any barriers to the use of actual meter readings.
Title
Permits the rendering of an estimated bill from a utility corporation or municipality under certain circumstances; requires each utility corporation and municipality within six months to submit to the commission a model procedure for the calculation of estimated bills that incorporates best practices and technology and accounts for any barriers to the use of actual meter readings.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Hinchey [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Dean Murray [R] | Sen. Robert Rolison [R] |
Sen. Lea Webb [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2024-03-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-03-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-01-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-01-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.217 |
2024-01-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1851B |
2024-01-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.614 |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | substituted for a888b |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-05-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-18 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2023-04-26 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1851A |
2023-04-26 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-04-26 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2023-03-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-02-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-02-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.231 |
2023-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00888 (Same As) 2023-06-07 - substituted by s1851a