NY S01850 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on November 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-13 - VETOED MEMO.172
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-13 - VETOED MEMO.172
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing county correction officers with a special optional twenty year retirement plan.
Title
Relates to providing county correction officers with a special optional twenty year retirement plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-13 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.172 |
2017-11-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.386 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a6277 |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2017-02-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-02-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.154 |
2017-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06277 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - substituted by s1850