NY S01838 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires scrap processors to record the license plate number of motor vehicles driven by sellers of scrap materials.
Title
Requires scrap processors to record the license plate number of motor vehicles driven by sellers of scrap materials.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1701 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1320 |
2017-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |