NY S01834 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-07 - SIGNED CHAP.580
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-07 - SIGNED CHAP.580
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits retail dealers of second hand motor vehicles from selling a motor vehicle which is subject to federal motor vehicle safety standards for inflatable restraint systems unless such vehicle is equipped with an inflatable restraint system which conforms to the federal motor vehicle safety standard applicable to that vehicle and a readiness indicator light indicating a functioning inflatable restraint system.
Title
Prohibits retail dealers of second hand motor vehicles from selling a motor vehicle which is subject to federal motor vehicle safety standards for inflatable restraint systems unless such vehicle is equipped with an inflatable restraint system which conforms to the federal motor vehicle safety standard applicable to that vehicle and a readiness indicator light indicating a functioning inflatable restraint system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-07 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.580 |
2021-10-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.284 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a394a |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1688 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-06-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1834A |
2021-06-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00394 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - substituted by s1834a