NY S01832 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Raises the civil jurisdictional limits to $10,000 for small claims.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Raises the civil jurisdictional limits to $10,000 for small claims.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11Assemblyreferred to judiciary
2019-02-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-02-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-02-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-01-29Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-01-28Senate1ST REPORT CAL.60
2019-01-16SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A04360 (Same As) 2019-02-04 - referred to judiciary

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback