NY S01827 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the board of education of the city school district of the city of New York to establish standards for admission to special high schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the board of education of the city school district of the city of New York to establish standards for admission to special high schools.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-08SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION
2013-05-22SenatePRINT NUMBER 1827A
2013-05-22SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION
2013-04-16SenateDEFEATED IN EDUCATION
2013-03-11SenateNOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
2013-01-09SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A04204 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to education

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback