NY S01826 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "New York call center jobs act"; requires prior notice of relocation of call center jobs from New York to a foreign country; directs the commissioner of labor to maintain a list of employers who move call center jobs; prohibits loans or grants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "New York call center jobs act"; requires prior notice of relocation of call center jobs from New York to a foreign country; directs the commissioner of labor to maintain a list of employers who move call center jobs; prohibits loans or grants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-03-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-07SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-07SenateAMENDED 1826C
2019-03-06Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-05Senate1ST REPORT CAL.225
2019-02-28SenatePRINT NUMBER 1826B
2019-02-28SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2019-02-12SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-02-01SenatePRINT NUMBER 1826A
2019-02-01SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR
2019-01-16SenateREFERRED TO LABOR

Same As/Similar To

A00567 (Same As) 2019-03-08 - print number 567c

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01826&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01826&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S01826
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01826&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S01826A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01826&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S01826B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01826&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S01826C
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S1826#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S1826#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S1826#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback