NY S01825 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - PRINT NUMBER 1825A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - PRINT NUMBER 1825A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a maximum temperature in school buildings and indoor facilities; provides a definition of extreme heat condition days and the standard to measure room temperature.
Title
Establishes a maximum temperature in school buildings and indoor facilities; provides a definition of extreme heat condition days and the standard to measure room temperature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1825A |
2022-03-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2021-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08214 (Same As) 2022-03-04 - print number 8214b