NY S01820 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - SUBSTITUTED BY A976
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the moratorium on the processing and approval of applications for licensure of licensed home care services agencies; permits the commissioner of health to grant exemptions from such moratorium.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the moratorium on the processing and approval of applications for licensure of licensed home care services agencies; permits the commissioner of health to grant exemptions from such moratorium.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A976
2019-02-26SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-02-12Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-02-11Senate1ST REPORT CAL.144
2019-01-16SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A00976 (Same As) 2019-02-28 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback