NY S01816 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of health to promote home care's integration into the state's health continuum strategy to address public health priorities in disease prevention, intervention, population health improvement, associated health care cost reduction and research.
Title
Directs the commissioner of health to promote home care's integration into the state's health continuum strategy to address public health priorities in disease prevention, intervention, population health improvement, associated health care cost reduction and research.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1237 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-04-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A03836 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to health