NY S01810 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - VETOED MEMO.157
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - VETOED MEMO.157
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Chester to establish community preservation funds; establishes a real estate transfer tax with revenues therefrom to be deposited in said community preservation fund.
Title
Authorizes the town of Chester to establish community preservation funds; establishes a real estate transfer tax with revenues therefrom to be deposited in said community preservation fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.157 |
2022-12-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.181 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a5585a |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2022-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1730 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1810A |
2022-05-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.711 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a5585 |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2021-05-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1268 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05585 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - substituted by s1810