NY S01799 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a first permanent payroll employee tax credit which allows a business to receive a tax credit for the three years following the employment of such business' first permanent payroll employee where such credit equals a portion of the amount it costs to employ such permanent payroll employee.
Title
Establishes a first permanent payroll employee tax credit which allows a business to receive a tax credit for the three years following the employment of such business' first permanent payroll employee where such credit equals a portion of the amount it costs to employ such permanent payroll employee.
Sponsors
Sen. George Borrello [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Daphne Jordan [R] |
Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] | Sen. Robert Ortt [R] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. James Tedisco [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Revenue Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2021-05-04 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-03-10 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2021-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A04871 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - held for consideration in ways and means