NY S01796 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing notice of voting rights to persons released from local jails including written information distributed by the board of elections.
Title
Relates to providing notice of voting rights to persons released from local jails including written information distributed by the board of elections.
Sponsors
Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] | Sen. Julia Salazar [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-02-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.295 |
2021-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A00690 (Same As) 2022-03-22 - amended on third reading 690a