NY S01792 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that medicaid and health insurance plans provide coverage for costs of prescription smoking cessation treatment that is ordered by a physician; establishes a coverage limit of $400 for each covered individual.
Title
Requires that medicaid and health insurance plans provide coverage for costs of prescription smoking cessation treatment that is ordered by a physician; establishes a coverage limit of $400 for each covered individual.
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-02-27 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2012-01-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1792A |
2012-01-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2011-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A02620 (Same As) 2012-01-19 - print number 2620a