NY S01790 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-14 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-14 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes police officers to arrest a driver of a motor vehicle in certain circumstances without a warrant.
Title
Authorizes police officers to arrest a driver of a motor vehicle in certain circumstances without a warrant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1609 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08642 (Same As) 2017-12-15 - enacting clause stricken
S07031 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - referred to transportation
S07031 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - referred to transportation