NY S01788 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.130
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.130
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a veterans' mental health and suicide prevention task force to examine, evaluate and determine how to improve mental health and suicide prevention for our veterans.
Title
Creates a veterans' mental health and suicide prevention task force to examine, evaluate and determine how to improve mental health and suicide prevention for our veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.130 |
2021-12-22 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.770 |
2021-12-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.331 |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a5836a |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1788A |
2021-02-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.216 |
2021-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A05836 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - substituted by s1788a