NY S01787 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-01 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the village of Northport, in Suffolk county, to hire a village clerk or deputy clerk who is not a resident of such village.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the village of Northport, in Suffolk county, to hire a village clerk or deputy clerk who is not a resident of such village.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-01SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2021-01-26Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2021-01-25Senate1ST REPORT CAL.167
2021-01-15SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback