NY S01787 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a sex offender whose victim was a child and level 3 sex offenders from knowingly being within 1,000 feet of a facility where pre-kindergarten or kindergarten instruction is provided.
Title
Prohibits a sex offender whose victim was a child and level 3 sex offenders from knowingly being within 1,000 feet of a facility where pre-kindergarten or kindergarten instruction is provided.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2018-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.652 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-02-28 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2017-02-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-02-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-02-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-01-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.98 |
2017-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A02605 (Same As) 2018-04-30 - enacting clause stricken