NY S01777 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - APPROVAL MEMO.3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - APPROVAL MEMO.3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Validates certain acts of the Newburgh Enlarged city school district and the Chester Union Free school district with regard to capital improvement projects and provides for payment of state aid for such projects.
Title
Validates certain acts of the Newburgh Enlarged city school district and the Chester Union Free school district with regard to capital improvement projects and provides for payment of state aid for such projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-24 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.3 |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.38 |
2019-06-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.538 |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | substituted for a7056 |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | referred to education |
2019-05-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.599 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07056 (Same As) 2019-06-24 - APPROVAL MEMO.3