NY S01765 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on December 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - VETOED MEMO.60
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - VETOED MEMO.60
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the closure of certain office of mental health, office for people with developmental disabilities or office of children and family services facilities and institutions.
Title
Relates to the closure of certain office of mental health, office for people with developmental disabilities or office of children and family services facilities and institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.60 |
2021-11-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.748 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a117c |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2021-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-01 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2021-05-25 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 1765A |
2021-05-25 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-05-25 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-02 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2021-03-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.196 |
2021-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A00117 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - substituted by s1765a