NY S01761 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A993A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A993A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the city of Rochester and the board of education of the city school district of the city of Rochester school facilities modernization program act by granting further authority to the RJSCB to modernize educational facilities in the city of Rochester.
Title
Amends the city of Rochester and the board of education of the city school district of the city of Rochester school facilities modernization program act by granting further authority to the RJSCB to modernize educational facilities in the city of Rochester.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Cities 2 Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Cities 2 Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A993A |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1267 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1761C |
2021-05-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2021-05-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-05-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1761B |
2021-05-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2021-05-04 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO EDUCATION |
2021-04-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1761A |
2021-04-28 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES 2 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO CITIES 2 |
2021-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00993 (Same As) 2021-11-15 - signed chap.614