NY S01750 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the state financial literacy fund which provides funding for project grants to organizations in order to establish financial capability and financial literacy programs, products content and/or services for at-risk populations in New York.
Title
Establishes the state financial literacy fund which provides funding for project grants to organizations in order to establish financial capability and financial literacy programs, products content and/or services for at-risk populations in New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO EDUCATION |
2024-04-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1750A |
2024-04-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BANKS |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2023-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A04605 (Same As) 2024-06-03 - print number 4605a