NY S01748 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - referred to banks
Pending: Assembly Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the New York state money transmission disclosure act; requires each licensee providing a transmission transaction which involves currency of one country into the currency of another country to provide the customer with a written disclosure; authorizes the superintendent of financial services to implement any necessary rules and regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the New York state money transmission disclosure act; requires each licensee providing a transmission transaction which involves currency of one country into the currency of another country to provide the customer with a written disclosure; authorizes the superintendent of financial services to implement any necessary rules and regulations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-28Assemblyreferred to banks
2024-03-28SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-03-28SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-01-22SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-01-17Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-01-16Senate1ST REPORT CAL.123
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO BANKS
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-03-21Assemblyreferred to banks
2023-03-21SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-03-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-03-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-03-01Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-02-28Senate1ST REPORT CAL.421
2023-01-13SenateREFERRED TO BANKS

Same As/Similar To

A05702 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to banks

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback