NY S01737 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates a wholesale prescription drug importation program which complies with federal standards and regulations for the purpose of generating substantial savings for consumers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates a wholesale prescription drug importation program which complies with federal standards and regulations for the purpose of generating substantial savings for consumers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-24Assemblyreferred to higher education
2022-05-24SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2022-05-24SenatePASSED SENATE
2022-05-23SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1421
2022-05-17SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2022-05-11SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2022-01-05SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2021-01-14SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A00133 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to higher education

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback