NY S01732 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.510
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.510
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Frontier central school district to establish an insurance reserve fund.
Title
Authorizes the Frontier central school district to establish an insurance reserve fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.510 |
2019-11-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.630 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a8139 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
2019-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1127 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08139 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.510