NY S01730 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.297
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the real property transfer tax return relating to residential property sold or purchased by a limited liability company to include information on the ownership of such company.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the real property transfer tax return relating to residential property sold or purchased by a limited liability company to include information on the ownership of such company.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 105 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-13AssemblySIGNED CHAP.297
2019-09-13SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading cal.543
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a7190
2019-06-17Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-17SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-17SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-02-12SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-02-11Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-02-05Senate1ST REPORT CAL.132
2019-01-16SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A07190 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s1730

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback