NY S01719 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4633A
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4633A
Summary
Designates employees of the village court of the village of Westhampton Beach serving as uniformed court officers as peace officers.
Title
Designates employees of the village court of the village of Westhampton Beach serving as uniformed court officers as peace officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-16 | SUBSTITUTED BY A4633A | |
2009-07-15 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.739 | |
2009-07-15 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2009-06-03 | PRINT NUMBER 1719A | |
2009-06-03 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES | |
2009-02-05 | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A04633 (Same As) 2009-08-13 - tabled
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S01719&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |