NY S01718 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - signed chap.536
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - signed chap.536
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the inclusion, at a voter's option, of an e-mail address in the voter registration application and record, whereupon notices and other communication required to be sent to the voter by the state board of elections shall be sent by e-mail in addition to postal mail; provides that county boards of elections and the board of elections of the city of New York shall have the option of sending required notices and communications by e-mail in addition to postal mail to certain voters.
Title
Provides for the inclusion, at a voter's option, of an e-mail address in the voter registration application and record, whereupon notices and other communication required to be sent to the voter by the state board of elections shall be sent by e-mail in addition to postal mail; provides that county boards of elections and the board of elections of the city of New York shall have the option of sending required notices and communications by e-mail in addition to postal mail to certain voters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Senate | signed chap.536 |
2019-11-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1126 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1718 |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-05-20 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-16 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.326 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | reported |
2019-02-27 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-15 | Senate | referred to election law |
2019-06-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1565 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1126 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-29 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01565 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - signed chap.536