NY S01695 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.149
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.149
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for retroactive effectiveness of provisions relating to prohibiting additional fees for a veteran's distinguishing mark on a non-driver identification card or a driver's license.
Title
Provides for retroactive effectiveness of provisions relating to prohibiting additional fees for a veteran's distinguishing mark on a non-driver identification card or a driver's license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.149 |
2015-08-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.498 |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | substituted for a6557 |
2015-02-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-02-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-02-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-01-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.28 |
2015-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A06557 (Same As) 2015-06-01 - substituted by s1695