NY S01680 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-8)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts "Kirby and Quigley's Law"; expands the definition of aggravated cruelty to animals to include harm to a companion animal during the commission of a felony.
Title
Enacts "Kirby and Quigley's Law"; expands the definition of aggravated cruelty to animals to include harm to a companion animal during the commission of a felony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2018-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1531 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1680A |
2018-05-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2017-01-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-01-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-01-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.41 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A03038 (Same As) 2018-05-15 - print number 3038b