NY S01670 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides a minimum penalty of $300 for a moving violation which results in the serious bodily injury or death of another person.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides a minimum penalty of $300 for a moving violation which results in the serious bodily injury or death of another person.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-09Assemblyreferred to transportation
2018-05-09SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-05-09SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-03-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-03-12Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-03-06Senate1ST REPORT CAL.605
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-03-06Assemblyreferred to transportation
2017-03-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-03-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-03-01SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-02-28Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-02-14Senate1ST REPORT CAL.218
2017-01-10SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A06562 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to transportation

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback