NY S01645 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all new private, one-family and two-family home construction contracts to include a cost estimate for installation of a fire sprinkler system.
Title
Requires all new private, one-family and two-family home construction contracts to include a cost estimate for installation of a fire sprinkler system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.191 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1645C |
2020-01-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2019-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.688 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.688 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1645B |
2019-05-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-04-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1645A |
2019-04-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A02468 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.106