NY S01643 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the fines for dumping snow onto handicapped parking spaces.
Title
Increases the fines for dumping snow onto handicapped parking spaces.
Sponsors
Sen. John Brooks [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2020-03-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-03-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.492 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-02-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-02-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-01-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.54 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00148 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to transportation